International Sports Federation for Athletes with an Intellectual Impairment

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Virtus: World Intellectual Impairment Sport enables more than 500,000 athletes with an intellectual impairment to compete and excel in sport. As a recognised member of the International Paralympic Committee, we organise a worldwide competition programme and are supported by member organisations in more than 80 countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Central African Republic
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- Estonia
- Faroe Islands
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Italy
- Japan
- Libya
- Macau
- Mauritius
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Russia
- Saudi Arabia
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United States
- Venezuela
Governance
- 21 July 2017: CIO registration
- 01 September 2017: Funds received from 1144903 INTERNATIONAL SPORTS FEDERATION FOR PERSONS WITH I...
- Virtus (Working name)
- INAS (Previous name)
- INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION FOR INTELLECTUAL IMPAIRMENT SPORT (Previous name)
- Virtus: World Intellectual Impairment Sport (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARC TRUFFAUT | Chair | 20 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Helen Croxford | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Benjamin | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yosef Romano | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Humberto Ferreira | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK CHAN | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMAL MOBADDA | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARRY HOLMAN | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF. JAN BURNS | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBYN SMITH | Trustee | 20 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.43k | £91.18k | £94.53k | £183.59k | £264.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.89k | £136.74k | £147.78k | £134.10k | £205.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jul 2017 as amended on 20 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE: 1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH AN INTELLECTUAL IMPAIRMENT BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THIS PURPOSE. 2) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PERSONS WITH AN INTELLECTUAL IMPAIRMENT WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, BY DEVELOPING ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE PARTICIPATION IN SPORTS ACTIVITIES AT ALL LEVELS AND TO RECOGNISE THE IMPORTANCE OF SPORT FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND INTEGRATION OF SUCH PERSONS IN TO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mailbox 13
Alison Business Centre
39-40 Alison Crescent
SHEFFIELD
S2 1AS
- Phone:
- 08456009890
- Email:
- enquiries@virtus.sport
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window