Trustees International Sports Federation for Athletes with an Intellectual Impairment
Charity number: 1173901

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARC TRUFFAUT | Chair | 20 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Helen Croxford | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Benjamin | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yosef Romano | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Humberto Ferreira | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK CHAN | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMAL MOBADDA | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BARRY HOLMAN | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF. JAN BURNS | Trustee | 01 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROBYN SMITH | Trustee | 20 April 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.