LIVE UNLIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports looked after children and care leavers in Barnet, to succeed and have the best possible life chances to lead happy and fulfilling lives through providing enrichment activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 21 December 2017: Standard registration
- 12 March 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1197754 LIVE UNLIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.65k | £82.33k | £115.21k | £237.99k | £62.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.10k | £55.84k | £96.56k | £129.04k | £55.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 DEC 2017 as amended on 15 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET CARE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND (C) SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING IMPROVEMENT IN THE EDUCATION ACHIEVEMENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window