HERTS AND ESSEX (WARE) SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We enable persons in East Hertfordshire and West Essex and the surrounding area as well as elsewhere who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, to receive confidential emotional support at any time of the day or night in order to improve their emotional health and reduce the incidence of suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £52,985
Total expenditure: £56,819

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Lane Trustee 09 November 2024
HARLOW CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED
Received: On time
Ayesha Camp Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Nayan Chauhan Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Karen Thomson Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Michael Houlihan Trustee 09 November 2024
None on record
Amanda Weeden Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Ian Warren Slater Trustee 09 November 2023
None on record
Jill Milner Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Guya Rabindra Persaud Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Morisha Kim Christy Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.03k £99.41k £130.33k £41.23k £52.99k
Total expenditure £37.52k £32.30k £55.24k £125.70k £56.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.50k £24.50k £8.00k £7.50k £15.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 04 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 August 2022 207 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCT 1969 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN EAST HERTFORDSHIRE AND WEST ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST SKILLS OR EXPERIENCE, AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS
Area of benefit
EAST HERTS WEST ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
  • 31 October 1969 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
c/o 1 Cross Street
WARE
SG12 7AH
Phone:
07518264420