Financial history THE LONG SUTTON MEN'S SHED

Charity Number: 1175464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.88k £29.44k £24.18k £14.21k £24.26k
Total expenditure £21.66k £17.34k £18.18k £20.46k £19.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.25k £11.00k £1.18k £14.21k £23.52k