Financial history MANCHESTER AND SALFORD SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.57k £54.40k £70.12k £82.20k £56.56k
Total expenditure £76.32k £65.07k £99.82k £76.90k £74.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £6.16k N/A N/A