Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN TONYFELIN

Charity Number: 1174011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £56.90k £65.92k £64.36k £41.07k £48.87k
Total expenditure £63.99k £38.59k £68.33k £57.20k £57.53k
Income from government contracts £19.07k £31.12k £8.46k N/A £17.51k
Income from government grants £3.38k N/A £16.00k £4.80k £3.82k