HOPE COMMUNITY GOSPEL CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community gospel choir affirming God's name and ministering to both members and the wider population through gospel music. We meet on Wednesday evenings (term time). We sing at various events arranged by ourselves or invited by other organisers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 12 February 2018: Standard registration
- HOPE GOSPEL CHOIR (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS C TOMLINSON | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||
Janya Wallington-Jones | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|||
Ian Lishman | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||
MS C ROSS-WADDELL | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.54k | £162 | £6.33k | £16.81k | £11.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.57k | £2.23k | £3.89k | £12.98k | £14.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 309 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 18 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY ANY MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Kneeton Vale
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 3DR
- Phone:
- 07788111833
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window