Accounts and annual returns WELSH DIGITAL DATA COLLECTION PLATFORM

Charity number: 1175771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 April 2024 12 February 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2023 05 October 2024 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2020 13 March 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2020 Not Required