IGNITE CHANGE CHARITABLE TRUST (ICCT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carry out charitable projects for those educationally disadvantaged and in hardship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 06 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AKBAR DHEDHI | Chair | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HENNA DHEDHI | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
FATIMA GADIT | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MD SHAHIDUL ISLAM | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SONIA DHEDHI | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.04k | £26.17k | £3.97k | £2.02k | £4.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.68k | £8.10k | £4.65k | £4.10k | £11.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
(1)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, MEDICINES, HEALTH AND HYGIENE EDUCATION AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS HOSPITALS, TESTING AND TREATMENT CENTRES AND CLINICS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2)TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG ORPHANS, WIDOWS, POOR PEOPLE, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, CLOTHING AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (3)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE ILLITERATE AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES, EQUIPMENT, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 8
Forest Industrial Park
Forest Road
ILFORD
Essex
- Phone:
- 07954427923
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window