WENDY'S WISH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief and assistance of persons in the United Kingdom who have cancer by: (1) the provision of grants to oncology centres, (2) the provision of financial support, (3) the provision of grants to other charitable bodies to further objects (1) and (2).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William George Harker | Chair | 05 March 2017 |
|
|||||
DAVID REED | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JILL HARKER | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.32k | £49.15k | £101.50k | £134.03k | £17.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.04k | £51.75k | £43.43k | £30.25k | £127.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO HAVE CANCER BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ONCOLOGY CENTRES (2) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO ASSIST WITH: (A) TRAVEL AND ACCOMMODATION COSTS DURING TREATMENT AND PALLIATION BREAKS AWAY WITH FAMILY/FRIENDS; AND (B) COMPUTER AND ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT FOR THE CONTINUED SUPPORT AND ACCESS TO FAMILY AND FRIENDS WHEREVER THEY MAY BE RECEIVING TREATMENT OR PALLIATION. (3) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES TO FURTHER OBJECTS (1) AND (2).
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 MILL HILL CRESCENT
NORTHALLERTON
DL6 1RY
- Phone:
- 01609780032
- Email:
- wendyswish2017@gmail.com
- Website:
-
wendyswish.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window