GWENT BEEKEEPERS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
encouragement, improvement and advancement of beekeeping for public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Torfaen
Governance
- 20 September 2017: CIO registration
- 03 December 2018: Funds received from 1014600 GWENT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
- GBK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Laing | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sami White | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Marc Leonard | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Evans | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Barrell | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cyrene Amie Dominguez | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eva Maria Christina Lindhe | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Simon Tuggey | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Hugh Holden | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Lewis Maloney | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.75k | £22.46k | £21.89k | £23.74k | £27.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.32k | £27.04k | £22.14k | £16.27k | £18.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Sep 2017 as amended on 06 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Holden Apiary & Study Centre
Llanover Road
Llanfair Kilgeddin
ABERGAVENNY
Gwent
NP7 9DY
- Phone:
- 07939293061
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window