NEWBORN, INFANT AND CHILD HEALTH EDUCATION INTERNATIONAL (ALSO KNOWN AS NICHE INTERNATIONAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide training in the care of newborn babies to healthcare staff in low-resource areas, in order to improve infant mortality rates and relieve sickness. We also provide training to candidate instructors, so that they can teach courses and make the process sustainable. We have taught in Cameroon, Liberia and Uganda, and plan to expand to other areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cameroon
- Liberia
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 October 2017: CIO registration
- NICHE INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALISON ROSEMARY EARLEY MB FRCP | Chair | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MADAR | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALISON GROVE | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIAN JAMES PALMER | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JULIA THOMSON | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALISTAIR PAUL MORRIS | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/10/2019 | 03/10/2020 | 03/10/2021 | 03/10/2022 | 03/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.68k | £9.23k | £4.53k | £15.33k | £33.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.59k | £13.61k | £521 | £21.70k | £11.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 October 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 October 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 October 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 October 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 October 2019 | 19 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 October 2019 | 19 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 04 OCT 2017 AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2018 as amended on 05 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
To relieve sickness and to promote and protect the good health of babies and children. To work to reduce mortality rates in low- and middle-income countries, by assisting in the provision of training courses and other healthcare projects.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lytchett House
Unit 13
Freeland Park
Wareham Road
POOLE
Dorset
- Phone:
- 07947003829
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window