FRIENDS OF GROVE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Grove School Owns, manages and runs The Birks which is an outdoor field centre located in The Duddon Valley, Cumbria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
Governance
- 03 October 1980: Standard registration
- FOGS (FRIENDS OF GROVE SCHOOL) (Working name)
- GROVE PTA (Working name)
- THE GROVE SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alexandra Consterdine | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ingham | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Corney | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Savill | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Machin | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alex Blank | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
COLETTE BOURNE | Trustee | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Craig Gilmour | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNY HARRISON | Trustee | 10 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.68k | £30.74k | £32.16k | £24.72k | £20.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.15k | £31.78k | £16.55k | £29.07k | £32.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £17.43k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grove School
Newcastle Road
MARKET DRAYTON
Shropshire
TF9 1HF
- Phone:
- 07876221593
- Email:
- lisa@thebirks.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window