BASIC INCOME EARTH NETWORK (BIEN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Basic Income Earth Network (BIEN) offers education about alternative arguments about, proposals for, and problems concerning, basic income as idea, institution, and public policy practice. BIEN organises public conferences around the world on an annual basis and serves as a repository of published research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- China
- Denmark
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Malawi
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Portugal
- Russia
- Scotland
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 08 February 2018: CIO registration
- BIEN (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sarath Chandra Davala | Chair | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Seng Kiat Lee | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fabienne Hansen | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lindsay Stirton | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hinford | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olaf Michael Johannes Ostertag | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jurgen De Wispelaere | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Patrick Grant | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Reinhard Huss | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Simon Duffy | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Howard | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Titcomb Knight | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Bashur | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilde Latour | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACOB ELIOT | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tyler Prochazka | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julio Linares | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE GLENDA MILLER | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.81k | £12.63k | £6.03k | £54.01k | £133.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.97k | £2.94k | £5.21k | £22.70k | £42.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Feb 2018 as amended on 21 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT BASIC INCOME, THAT IS, A PERIODIC CASH PAYMENT DELIVERED TO ALL ON AN INDIVIDUAL BASIS, WITHOUT MEANS TEST OR WORK REQUIREMENT; TO SERVE AS A LINK BETWEEN THE INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS COMMITTED TO, OR INTERESTED IN, BASIC INCOME; TO STIMULATE AND DISSEMINATE RESEARCH ABOUT BASIC INCOME; AND TO FOSTER INFORMED PUBLIC DISCUSSION ON BASIC INCOME THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Kedale Road
Seaford
East Sussex
BN25 2BU
- Phone:
- 07428665256
- Email:
- bien@basicincome.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window