ASANTOA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work with disadvantaged communities and families in the Ashanti region of Ghana. Provide educational support to enable children in isolated villages to attend school; up-skill and equip individuals to become financially independent, and to build sustainable communities through the development of small enterprises run by and for the communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Ghana
Governance
- 16 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES THOMAS | Chair | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hayden | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DWAYNE NEVEU | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131 | £131 | £1.31k | £1.58k | £623 | |
|
Total expenditure | £180 | £180 | £1.06k | £1.13k | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 April 2025 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 April 2025 | 179 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 August 2024 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 August 2024 | 279 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 February 2022 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 February 2022 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2021 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY [OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP] IN GHANA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF THE ASHANTI REGION OF GHANA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN THEIR OWN COMMUNITY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ASANTOA MODEL SCHOOL IN KUMASI, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL RESOURCES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 LOW WOOD ROAD
ERDINGTON
BIRMINGHAM
B23 6HE
- Phone:
- 07964129551
- Email:
- info@asantoa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window