Financial history STOGURSEY ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1175827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £2.60k £6.33k £2.15k £1.06k £1.24k
Total expenditure £2.30k £73 £1.45k £1.95k £850
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A