Accounts and annual returns WATER SMART FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1176405
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 July 2023 02 September 2024 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 02 September 2024 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 June 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 June 2022 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 June 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 June 2021 17 days late Download Open in new window