WATER SMART FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the public the smart use of water as a sustainable life-giving resource for human health and the environment. Activities include providing alternative means of providing water which reduce carbon emissions and plastic pollution. The Water Smart Foundation supports partner charities in their activities according to our aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cyprus
- France
- Italy
- Kenya
- Monaco
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 20 December 2017: CIO registration
- WSF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dodo Cunningham-Reid | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLARE STEWART MUNN | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
KSENIA TARASENKO | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNA ZUCCHI | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £1.53k | £152 | £0 | £543 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £640 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 June 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 June 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD THE “SMART”* USE OF WATER AS A SUSTAINABLE LIFE-GIVING RESOURCE FOR: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH 2. THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY THE REDUCTION OF GLOBAL POLLUTION CAUSED BY CURRENT METHODS OF PRODUCTION, STORAGE AND DISTRIBUTION OF WATER, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY: A. REDUCTION OF THE USE OF PLASTIC BOTTLES WHICH CAUSE ENVIRONMENTAL POLLUTION IN LANDFILL SITES AND THE WORLD’S OCEANS B. REDUCTION OF THE CARBON FOOTPRINT CAUSED BY THE PRODUCTION METHODS, AND UNNECESSARY TRANSPORTATION, OF WATER IN PLASTIC BOTTLES 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN: A. TECHNIQUES TO MAXIMISE THE SUSTAINABILITY OF EXISTING SUPPLIES, AND DEVELOPMENT OF NEW SUPPLIES OF CLEAN WATER B. THE PROVISION, STORAGE, DISTRIBUTION AND USE OF CLEAN WATER *"SMART" USE OF WATER REFERS TO MAKING EFFICIENT USE OF WATER BY NOT WASTING IT, REUSING IT AND CLEANING IT TO A HIGH LEVEL SO THAT IT DOES NOT POLLUTE, AS SUCH, ADDRESSING WATER SCARCITY ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sail Loft
81a Endell St
LONDON
WC2H 9DX
- Phone:
- 01727 884588
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window