CF WARRIORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's main activities are: a) We provide Warrior Packs that contain goods and/or equipment that can be used to aid the fitness and health of people with cystic fibrosis; b) We fund research into cystic fibrosis, in particular the effects of exercise on people with cystic fibrosis and any treatments that can potentially aid recovery before, during and after exercise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSH LLEWELLYN-JONES OBE | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Gadd | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Doyle | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL LANGMAID CBE | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.76k | £28.96k | £42.31k | £74.34k | £79.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.20k | £77.93k | £52.00k | £67.41k | £90.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS BY: A) PROVIDING GOODS AND/OR EQUIPMENT THAT CAN BE USED TO AID THE FITNESS AND HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS AND SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL ADVICE FOR CARRYING OUT APPROPRIATE FORMS OF EXERCISE; B) PROVIDING FUNDING FOR RESEARCH INTO CYSTIC FIBROSIS, IN PARTICULAR THE TREATMENT OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS AND THE EFFECTS OF EXERCISE ON PEOPLE WITH CYSTIC FIBROSIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 1
Chorley
Penllyn Estate Farm
Cowbridge
Vale of Glamorgan
UK
- Phone:
- 07468599784
- Email:
- INFO@CFWARRIORS.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window