CHAPEL ALLERTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Church providing sunday services (for adults and kids), pastoral care, weekday youth clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 03 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Hamborg-Floyd | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Turner | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Greig Thomson | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Janet McGill | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hirst | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Hatton | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.57k | £86.34k | £92.12k | £81.50k | £86.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.97k | £77.28k | £94.27k | £97.41k | £65.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
506 Stonegate Road
LEEDS
LS17 6AR
- Phone:
- 07500908078
- Email:
- office@chapela.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window