JAMIATUS SALIHAT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and sickness; the promotion of good health and the advancement of the Islamic religion worldwide. Helping to relieve poverty internationally by supporting organisation?s which provide education to poor children by way of donations. The advancement of education of orphans and underprivileged children, particular but not exclusively in India by the provision of grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 24 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZIYAULHAQ SANAULLAH AHMED | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|||||
MOHMEDYASIN ABDULHAQ MAULVI | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
IMRAN MOHMED CHATI | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHMED SHAFI ISMAIL AHMED | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.55k | £84.94k | £39.84k | £69.03k | £111.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.11k | £10.40k | £38.74k | £120.99k | £65.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYÆS OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS; THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMICRELIGION WORLDWIDE. HELPING TO RELIEVE POVERTY INTERNATIONALLY BY SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONÆS WHICH PROVIDE EDUCATION TO POOR CHILDREN BY WAY OF DONATIONS. ACTIVELY SEEKING OUT ORGANISATIONS WHICH REQUIRE AIDED SUPPORT TO HELP FUND THESE ORGANISATIONS IN THE INTEREST OF PUBLIC BENEFIT. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ORPHANS AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN,PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 MOSS STREET
BLACKBURN
BB1 5HW
- Phone:
- 07720723064
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window