Governing document ANN CONROY TRUST
Charity number: 510582
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/09/1980 AS AMENDED ON 15/01/1983 AS AMENDED ON 21/08/1996 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 22/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO SYRINGOMYELIA AND RELATED CONDITIONS, AND TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING SUPPORT FOR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THESE CONDITIONS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.