Financial history BRUNSWICK PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1174170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £29.88k £16.39k £6.64k £15.22k £20.04k
Total expenditure £25.60k £7.88k £13.24k £7.31k £8.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A