BEACON PARK TENNIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain a public tennis facility in central Lichfield Promote healthy living through fitness Provide a facility that can be used by local schools and netball clubs Provide a programme of tennis and other sporting activities for Lichfield and promote tennis participation for all ages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHIL SHAW | Chair | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Broomfield | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Slater | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Bates | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATARINA OBRANOVIC O'DELL | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN CLARKE | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/09/2019 | 21/09/2020 | 21/09/2021 | 21/09/2022 | 21/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.12k | £201.69k | £34.29k | £21.53k | £24.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £537 | £170.83k | £28.45k | £12.39k | £8.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £81.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LICHFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 7459
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS14 4LX
- Phone:
- 07740651599
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window