THE FRIENDS OF ASTON HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aston House is a purpose built 48 bedded care home offering Dementia, Nursing, Respite and End of Life care. The home also provides specialist care for young people with physical disabilities and learning difficulties. The Friends aim to improve the quality of life of the residents of the care home by working with staff, residents and relatives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 August 2017: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ASTON HOUSE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID WOOD OBE | Chair | 10 June 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||
Zong-Yan Lin | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||
Vivienne Berg | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||
NICHOLE WHEATON | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.41k | £500 | £1 | £536 | £5.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.61k | £3.52k | £4.31k | £2.60k | £5.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUN 2015 as amended on 25 Feb 2021 as amended on 15 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SOCIAL ISOLATION OF THE ELDERLY IN ASTON HOUSE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES OVER AND ABOVE THOSE PROVIDED FOR THE RESIDENTS OF ASTON HOUSE, PARTICULARLY WITH A VIEW TO HELPING THE RESIDENTS OF THE CARE HOME AND ELDERLY PEOPLE IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY UNDERTAKE REWARDING ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11-13 CAVENDISH SQUARE
LONDON
W1G 0AN
- Phone:
- 02073072570
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window