Accounts and annual returns WOODHOUSE GROVE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1176406
Charity reporting is up to date (95 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 October 2024 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 03 October 2024 95 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 July 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 06 July 2023 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window