Financial history AGE CYMRU POWYS

Charity Number: 1174222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £217.62k £460.71k £232.90k £228.74k £384.05k
Total expenditure £215.85k £264.61k £283.65k £286.80k £333.87k
Income from government contracts £56.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.92k £52.77k £61.89k N/A £35.08k