SAMARITANS OF SLOUGH, WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD

Charity number: 1173807
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ENABLE PERSONS IN SLOUGH, WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS WELL AS ELSEWHERE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING FEELINGS OF DISTRESS OR DESPAIR, INCLUDING THOSE WHO MAY BE AT RISK OF SUICIDE, TO RECEIVE CONFIDENTIAL EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AT ANY TIME OF THE DAY OR NIGHT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND TO REDUCE THE INCIDENCE OF SUICIDE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £102,958
Total expenditure: £45,933

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Slough
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1970: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Judy Wright Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Sara Caroline Hughes Trustee 24 July 2024
None on record
Carol Williams Trustee 21 July 2021
THE FARNHAM COMMON COMMUNITY LIBRARY
Received: On time
Janet Elizabeth Allen Trustee 27 August 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, DENHAM
Received: On time
Graeme Buck Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record
PETER ADRIAN LEACH Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52.77k £85.02k £49.58k £70.47k £102.96k
Total expenditure £37.87k £49.77k £49.56k £64.89k £45.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.50k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 May 2024 99 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1970, AS AMENDED 17 JUNE 1977, 11 OCTOBER 1977 AND SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER DATED 9 JANUARY 1979, AS AMENDED 25 JANUARY 1996, 24 OCTOBER 2006 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 22 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN SLOUGH, WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS,
Area of benefit
SLOUGH AND DISTRICT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA
Registration history
  • 27 November 1970 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
KATHARINE HOUSE
17 Uxbridge Road
SLOUGH
SL1 1SN
Phone:
0330 094 5717