THE GOOD SAMARITANS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main objective has always been to model ourselves on the scriptures of Good Samaritan whether at home or abroad. We aim that nobody may go to bed hungry and therefore tagged one of our Projects as DONT GO TO BED GUNGRY. Additionally, we provide weekly employment support through Job Club to help recipients gain employment and earn a living to improve relationships and community co-existence
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MALCOLM OLIVER | Chair | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PETAR IVANOV | Trustee | 11 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
OLUSOLA IBRAHIM | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
||||||
OLUWATOSIN SOETAN | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|||||||
Pastor Rasaq Ibrahim | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £185 | £14 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 November 2024 | 370 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 November 2024 | 370 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 November 2022 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
-TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM FIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH MISSIONARY WORK. -THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A FOOD BANK. -TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.”
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Cupfields Avenue
Tipton
DY4 0RE
- Phone:
- 07960306394
- Email:
- pastorrasaq@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window