INTERNATIONAL DANCE WRITING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) the support and improvement of writing on dance in all its forms, (b) encouraging young writers on cultural issues to extend their scope to include the dance form, (c) setting up and maintaining awards to recognise outstanding achievements in writing on dance, (d) encouraging, and organising events bringing together writers and exponents of dance. (e) publishing 'Clement Crisp Reviews'
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- China
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- Japan
- New Zealand
- Russia
Governance
- 30 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERALD DOWLER | Trustee | 29 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WARDROP | Trustee | 29 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE LEVENE | Trustee | 29 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £23.59k | £10.76k | £698 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £11.19k | £27.56k | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF DANCE IN ALL ITS FORMS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY :- A) THE SUPPORT AND IMPROVEMENT OF WRITING ON DANCE IN ALL ITS FORMS AND THEIR ALLIED ARTISTIC ENDEAVOURS IN THE UK AND THE ENGLISH SPEAKING WORLD, (B) ENCOURAGING YOUNG WRITERS ON CULTURAL ISSUES TO EXTEND THEIR SCOPE TO INCLUDE THE DANCE FORM, (C) SETTING UP AND MAINTAINING AWARDS TO RECOGNISE OUTSTANDING ACHIEVEMENTS IN WRITING ON DANCE, (D) INITIATING, ENCOURAGING AND ORGANISING EVENTS BRINGING TOGETHER WRITERS AND EXPONENTS OF DANCE TO STRENGTHEN KNOWLEDGE AMONGST ALL INTERESTED COMMUNITIES AND ALSO THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 SEDLESCOMBE ROAD
LONDON
SW6 1RE
- Phone:
- 02073856738
- Email:
- davidwardrop6@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window