WILMSLOW UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (WILMSLOW U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wilmslow U3A organises activities in the Wilmslow and surrounding area designed for the further education, through self help, of those no longer in full time education. Various social activities for members are also arranged as well as a monthly meeting for all members for which a speaker or entertainment is arranged
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 29 August 2017: Standard registration
- WILMSLOW U3A (Working name)
- WILMSLOW UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Every | Chair | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mangnall | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elizabeth Bryant | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Grace | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERRY DOLDEN | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Fossdyke | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Cook | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Mangnall | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Edmund Highfield | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Cookson | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £2.88k | £6.89k | £14.96k | £15.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.25k | £6.28k | £11.58k | £13.89k | £14.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN WILMSLOW AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY AND. (II) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Vardon Drive
WILMSLOW
Cheshire
SK9 2AQ
- Phone:
- 01625 526010
- Email:
- secretary@wilmslowu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window