OSWESTRY AND BORDER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 09 November 1980: Standard registration
- 10 December 2005: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 December 2005: Funds transferred to 1085220 CITIZENS ADVICE SHROPSHIRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREAS OF OSWESTRY BOROUGH COUNCIL,OSWESTRY TOWN COUNCIL,NORTH SHROPSHIRE DISTRICT COUNCIL,LLANFYLLIN TOWN COUNCIL,MONTGOMERY DISTRICT COUNCIL AND SURROUNDONG AREA BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2(2) OF CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window