Accounts and annual returns BARRY EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH
Charity number: 1173861
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 4 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window