HCB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide charitable grants, mainly in Hampshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 05 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW WALSH | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SARAH KING | Trustee | 21 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HARRISON | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £700 | £0 | £800 | £125 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £290 | £366 | £626 | £137 | £175 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 APR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) THAT BENEFIT THE PUBLIC PRIMARILY IN HAMPSHIRE; TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IF THE PUBLIC IN HAMPSHIRE WILL ALSO BENEFIT INDIRECTLY. (2) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO THOSE DEMONSTRATING GENUINE NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eastleigh Borough Council
Eastleigh House
Upper Market Street
EASTLEIGH
Hampshire
SO50 9YN
- Phone:
- 023806880000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window