FRIENDS OF ST MICHAELS CHURCH, CHERRY BURTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help fund the preservation and general maintenance of the fabric and churchyard of St. Michael's Church, Cherry Burton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 February 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE EDWARD SWEETING | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alan Woodhead | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE HARGREAVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.10k | £3.41k | £4.66k | £8.11k | £7.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £20.78k | £785 | £9.47k | £6.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 1980
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL IN THE PRESERVATION OF THE ADORNMENTS OF ST. MICHAEL'S PARISH CHURCH AND THE GENERAL MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH AND CHURCH YARD, ITS ACTIVITIES, ITS SERVICES, ITS ORNAMENTS AND FURNISHINGS AND TO PROMOTE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE CHURCH, ITS HISTORY AND ITS WORK.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF CHERRY BURTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Bishop Burton Road
Cherry Burton
Nr Beverley
East Yorkshire
HU17 7RW
- Phone:
- 01964 550191
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window