ST MARGARET CLITHEROW SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1175735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School events to raise money for school

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £21,135
Total expenditure: £22,058

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melinda Lee Spence Chair 17 January 2023
None on record
Chikku Karayath Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record
Julia Walsh Trustee 03 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £18.71k £8.05k £3.46k £15.57k £21.14k
Total expenditure £15.23k £13.84k £3.52k £13.63k £22.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 November 2023 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
45 Jaguar Lane
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG12 9SA
Phone:
07814514477
Website:

No information available