CARTERTON FAMILY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for the daily care, recreation and education of children during and out of school hours and school holidays and to advance education, promote the preservation and protection of good health, and relieve the effects of poverty amongst residents of Carterton, Oxfordshire and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Woollard | Chair | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Guest | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Katrina Chappell | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Rose Bauer | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Godwin | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £401.38k | £189.11k | £128.21k | £146.43k | £146.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.34k | £248.44k | £237.95k | £150.76k | £149.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £98.07k | £97.40k | £13.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2017 as amended on 06 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING AND OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY AMONGST RESIDENTS OF CARTERTON, OXFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES PARTICULAR THOSE AIMED AT PROMOTING GOOD HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY AND HELPING PEOPLE MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS IN SOCIETY. (3) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CARTERTON, OXFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Allandale Youth House
8 Burford Road
CARTERTON
Oxfordshire
OX18 3AA
- Phone:
- 01993943903
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window