CHESTER-LE-STREET AMATEUR ROWING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote rowing at all levels Promote opportunities for competitive rowing, including land training Promote opportunities for recreational rowing, including land training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,270 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 October 2017: Standard registration
- CHESTER LE STREET AMATEUR ROWING CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Jane Payne | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Garry Steven Smith | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINSEY BURFORD | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER PALMER | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
GORDON JOHN CLARK | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.82k | £19.82k | £30.68k | £21.93k | £45.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.82k | £27.42k | £30.91k | £44.27k | £43.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 DEC 2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05 OCT 2017 as amended on 20 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, ENCOURAGEMENT AND INSTRUCTION IN THE SPORT OF ROWING, FOR THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHESTER–LE–STREET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C11
Marquis Court
Team Valley Trading Estate
GATESHEAD
Tyne And Wear
NE11 0RU
- Phone:
- 07891 649879
- Email:
- garry.smith@clsarc.com
- Website:
-
clsarc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window