Financial history UPTOWN YOUTH SERVICES

Charity number: 1175689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.92k £81.08k £94.33k £86.65k £88.46k
Total expenditure £42.91k £46.61k £76.36k £76.02k £81.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.00k £56.14k £31.99k £22.16k