MOLD MISSION AREA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public worship, sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting sick and bereaved persons. Teaching Christianity through sermons/small groups, taking assemblies in local Schools. Promoting the mission of Church in Wales to aid community cohesion through events, services, distribution of literature, groups to support the elderly/young
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £4,400 from 4 government grant(s)
People

24 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
Governance
- 05 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Weston | Chair | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Carol Ann Owen | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
David Meurig Walker | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Jill Batchelor | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
LINDSAY CATHERINE WILDING | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
DARYL ANNE AUSTIN | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Zenon Alexander Hoppe | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL JOHN MARK CORDINER | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
PETER JOHN DAVIES | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID DOUGLAS WRIGHT | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH HELLEN | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jeanette Mary Wilkes | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JOSEPH KENNETH BICKERTON | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Maguire | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew Alexander Taylor | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
DAWN MARIE WOLSTENHOLME | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Esther Joanna Andrews | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Adrian Maguire | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Canon Martin John Batchelor | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev DANIEL JOSEPH SHINE STROUD | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr WENDY ELIZABETH SHILLITO | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev KATHRYN SUSAN STEWART | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
KENNETH MASSEY | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.08k | £415.78k | £283.56k | £385.41k | £425.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.59k | £371.29k | £317.13k | £427.46k | £356.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.35k | £5.25k | £3.00k | N/A | £4.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MAR 1920
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL, IN THE PARISH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Pen Y Coed
Nannerch
MOLD
Clwyd
CH7 5RS
- Phone:
- 01352741854
- Email:
- kevinweston@cinw.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window