NEW LIFE WOOD

Charity Number: 1176061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve unemployment for the benefit of the public in Essex, by the provision of opportunities for volunteering, training and work experience to increase their employability by means of a wood recycling project based in Pitsea; and to relieve financial hardship by the provision of courses in money management and debt counselling.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £190,876
Total expenditure: £156,859

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew McClintock Chair 02 September 2019
RAYLEIGH VINEYARD
Received: On time
Martin Kett Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Stephen Dean Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Lesley Anne M'Clelland Trustee 20 February 2019
None on record
COLIN LEONARD GABELL Trustee 11 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £174.20k £204.02k £136.60k £158.26k £190.88k
Total expenditure £127.45k £206.55k £156.70k £155.71k £156.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.53k £5.00k £23.50k £19.10k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 02 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 02 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit A the Old Laboratory
Wat Tyler Country Park
Pitsea Hall Lane
Pitsea
BASILDON
SS16 4UH
Phone:
01268211568