Financial history SOS SILENCE OF SUICIDE

Charity number: 1175795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/06/2020 20/06/2021 20/06/2022 20/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.02k £86.83k £50.08k £1.53m £1.79m
Total expenditure £8.54k £36.77k £60.89k £166.71k £912.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k N/A £5.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.53m £1.79m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £7.50k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £112.80k £912.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £53.90k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £112.80k £54.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0