NORTHFLEET & EBBSFLEET LIONS CLUB CIO

Charity Number: 1174486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising and community service organisation primarily for the benefit of people in the local community but exceptionally for those in need nationally and internationally.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £30,112
Total expenditure: £25,265

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 September 2017: CIO registration
  • 26 July 2019: Funds received from 273654 NORTHFLEET & EBBSFLEET LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FU...
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER FRANCIS Chair 12 June 2017
None on record
Lorna Cross Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
L esley Howes Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
Sandra Jean Wade Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
COLIN MALCOLM READY Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record
MICHAEL WILSON Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record
MICHAEL ANTHONY PARKER Trustee 12 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.21k £2.11k £17.14k £34.98k £30.11k
Total expenditure £25.32k £1.33k £9.82k £28.32k £25.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 26 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 20 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 27 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 17 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
46 Tradescant Drive
Meopham
Gravesend
DA13 0EF
Phone:
01474815916