Financial history ETERNITY MINISTRIES UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1176657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.53k £5.50k £7.51k £11.71k £11.65k
Total expenditure £5.84k £2.89k £7.28k £12.57k £11.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A