ETERNITY MINISTRIES UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Living with eternity in view, we exist to take the whole gospel of Christ to all mankind having a holistic approach to the Christian faith; Spiritual, Social, Emotional, Educational and Physical needs packaged in the love of Christ. To work independently or in partnership with others for the relief of poverty, temporary suffering and infirmities to the poor and disadvantaged in the communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMANUEL MADUABUCHI OHIA | Chair | 22 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
KALTUME AKUBO | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
UDEME OHIA | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLUMIDE ALUKO | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.53k | £5.50k | £7.51k | £11.71k | £11.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £2.89k | £7.28k | £12.57k | £11.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
WE EXIST TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ENGLAND AND WALES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP AND PRAYER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 CROSSLEY STREET
MANCHESTER
M18 8BA
- Phone:
- 01612237688
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window