FURNESS ACADEMY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our PTFA supports the Furness Academy Inspiration Fund, inspiring students to succeed and fulfil their potential by exploring their talents and skills outside of the normal school academic focus.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 July 2017: Standard registration
- 13 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FURNESS ACADEMY PTFA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window