BRITISH SOCIETY FOR RESEARCH ON AGEING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to increase knowledge of the processes, causes and effects of ageing, and means for counteracting these, both in human beings and in other organisms. We provide funding for researchers interested in studying the fundamental biological mechanisms of ageing and we seek to increase the capacity of the UK science and technology base to conduct this and related research over the medium term.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 August 2017: CIO registration
- 26 March 2019: Funds received from 279932 BRITISH SOCIETY FOR RESEARCH ON AGEING
- BSRA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Weinkove | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diana Marcu | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Murray | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MILLS OBE | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Paul Potter | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Raven | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jon Houseley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hector Zenil | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Joanisse | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tina Woods | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Niharika Duggal | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ira Milosevic | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Morgan | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bradley Elliott | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.93k | £10.23k | £11.90k | £19.56k | £106.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.46k | £21.83k | £7.32k | £25.19k | £125.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 15 December 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 15 December 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 01 November 2021 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE PROCESSES, CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF AGEING AND INTO MEANS FOR COUNTERACTING THESE, BOTH IN HUMAN BEINGS AND IN OTHER ORGANISMS INCLUDING BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF ALL THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Durham University
Science Site
South Road
Durham
DH1 3LE
- Phone:
- 07981 993 912
- Email:
- Secretary@BSRA.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window