ASKERN COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? Lending books ? Trying to make everyone feel included & heard. ? Readers Group ? Life Story Project (Dementia Group) Reminiscing about past events, quizzes, games & social activities. ? Dancing small children to young adults ? Coffee Morning everyone welcome for a natter ? Basic Computer Skills with our trained staff ? Craft/fundraising days ? Events and activities throughout the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
Governance
- 10 October 2017: CIO registration
- ASKERN LIBRARY COMMUNITY HUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Maith | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Shaw | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Edward Collins | Trustee | 07 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Iris Beech | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
ZOE GARNETT | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS VIKKI PRIESTLEY | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2019 | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.00k | £21.08k | £12.34k | £9.85k | £12.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.36k | £13.58k | £7.87k | £7.50k | £13.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 442 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 442 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 14 December 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 14 December 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ASKERN IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE, AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ASKERN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DONCASTER MET BOROUGH COUNCIL
ASKERN LIBRARY
STATION ROAD
ASKERN
DONCASTER
DN6 0JA
- Phone:
- 01302700324
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window