SHEFFIELD SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1173942
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sheffield Samaritans provides confidential emotional support, by telephone, face to face, email and letter. We provide assistance to individuals who are suicidal, despairing or in distress in order to reduce the incidence of suicide. We advance education by providing society with a better understanding of suicide, suicidal behaviour, and the value of expressing feelings that may lead to suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £81,228
Total expenditure: £110,772

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 November 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Jones Chair 27 October 2022
None on record
Shehla Ali Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Frances Gray Trustee 27 October 2022
None on record
Chris Collin Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Wright Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Andrew Philip Denniff Trustee 03 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.81k £148.63k £87.72k £85.33k £81.23k
Total expenditure £101.76k £109.01k £107.46k £103.23k £110.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £37.78k £3.23k N/A £7.25k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 February 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 February 2024 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1963/1964 AS AMENDED 22 NOVEMBER 1988, 24 APRIL 1991 25 APRIL 2006 AND 21 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA [BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA] TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS; AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANSS
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF SHEFFIELD
Registration history
  • 04 November 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
272 Queens Road
Sheffield
S2 4DL
Phone:
01142767279